INTERNATIONAL DISASTER & EMERGENCY AID WITH LONG TERM SUPPORT

Charity number: 1080144
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

HUMANITARIAN AND MEDICAL AID PROJECTS PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID AND SUPPORT FOR ALL ASPECTS OF MEDICINE AND SURGERY. MIDWIFERY TRAINING ASSISTANCE WITH DISABILITY REHABILITATION CONSULTANCY IN TECHNICAL AND MEDICAL ADVICE TRAUMA TRAINING CONTINUATION OF PREVIOUS SIMILAR ACTIVITIES. SUPPORT FOR INDIVIDUALS WITH NEUROLOGICAL DISEASE OR INJURY MOBILE MEDICAL TEAMS FLOOD RELIEF

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £412,013
Total expenditure: £246,833

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Lebanon
  • Occupied Palestinian Territories

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 March 2000: Standard registration
  • 01 March 2023: Funds received from 297328 HAND IN HAND GROUP
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • I.D.E.A.L.S. (Working name)
  • IDEALS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Dr Andrew Ferguson Chair 11 January 2015
INTERNATIONAL DISASTER & EMERGENCY AID WITH LONG TERM SUPPORT
Received: On time
FOUNDATION FOR FAMILY MEDICINE IN PALESTINE
Received: On time
Basil Budair MBBS FRCS Trustee 18 January 2024
INTERNATIONAL DISASTER & EMERGENCY AID WITH LONG TERM SUPPORT
Received: On time
Timothy Edward Elliott Goodacre Trustee 05 April 2022
INTERFACE UGANDA
Received: On time
THE BLOND MCINDOE RESEARCH FOUNDATION
Received: 87 days late
The International Medical Education Trust
Received: On time
INTERNATIONAL DISASTER & EMERGENCY AID WITH LONG TERM SUPPORT
Received: On time
Nigel Silman Trustee 27 October 2017
WILTON MENS SHED
Received: On time
Oliver McTernan Trustee 30 June 2014
None on record
SARAH LOUISE PHILLIPS Trustee 07 February 2013
None on record
ALAN FREDERICK GRAEME GROOM Trustee 24 October 2011
INTERNATIONAL DISASTER & EMERGENCY AID WITH LONG TERM SUPPORT
Received: On time
Dr EAMON MCCOY Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £94.10k £70.48k £48.01k £75.89k £412.01k
Total expenditure £120.14k £45.39k £65.78k £81.25k £246.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 14 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 14 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 14 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
17 CARSICK VIEW ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S10 3LZ
Phone:
01142306900