DODDISCOMBSLEIGH COMMUNITY PRE-SCHOOL GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community Pre-School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £26,115 from 1 government contract(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 04 January 2000: Standard registration
- 14 July 2023: Funds received from 1028874 CHUDLEIGH PRE-SCHOOL
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Morwenna Redwood | Chair | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charlotte Jones | Trustee | 13 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD PARKER | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
CARLI RACHEL HOlMES | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.53k | £31.90k | £53.16k | £53.20k | £67.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.40k | £35.73k | £51.87k | £58.76k | £55.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £20.26k | £17.40k | £26.71k | £31.29k | £26.12k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 March 2025 | 39 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 11 March 2025 | 39 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 294 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 March 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 March 2023 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 281 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2022 | 281 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 April 2021 | 81 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 April 2021 | 81 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 10/11/2009
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS. FOR FULL DETAILS SEE CONSTITUTION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE DODDISCOMBSLEIGH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Doddiscombsleigh Pre-School
Doddiscombsleigh
Exeter
EX6 7PR
- Phone:
- 01647253695
- Email:
- preschool@doddi.devon.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window