Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF OLD SNEED PARK NATURE RESERVE

Charity Number: 1080376
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 22 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 31 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2021 07 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 17 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 25 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required