Financial history THE NATIONAL YOUTH BRASS BAND OF GREAT BRITAIN

Charity number: 1085724
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £265.63k £133.51k £322.84k £300.48k £342.38k
Total expenditure £232.79k £117.99k £295.39k £337.88k £363.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £900 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £118.14k £119.26k £149.76k £119.26k £119.26k