THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF TORTOISE KEEPERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Rescue of Tortoises Fostering of Tortoises Talks to improve Tortoise Husbandry Information Days at Charity Events
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 November 2000: Standard registration
- BATK (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLYN COLLINS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
JANIS FIELD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LINDA JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ANNE COLLINS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.30k | £1.96k | £868 | £829 | £944 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.64k | £475 | £303 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 15 February 2025 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 07 January 2024 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 17 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 17 March 2021 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APRIL 1998 AS AMENDED ON 25 APRIL 1999, 3 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 22 OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE HUMANE BEHAVIOUR TOWARDS TORTOISES BY PROVIDING APPROPRIATE CARE, PROTECTION, TREATMENT AND SECURITY FOR SUCH TORTOISES THAT ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS, MALTREATMENT, POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR ILL USAGE AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MATTERS PERTAINING TO TORTOISE HUSBANDRY IN GENERAL AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY AND SUFFERING AMONG TORTOISES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 ABBEY LANE
SOUTHAM
CV47 1HR
- Phone:
- 07977517918
- Email:
- lindaj.batk@btinternet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window