CHIL PLYMOUTH LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Health and well being. Group work, individual one to one work, signposting, advice and support to the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Total income includes £9,165 from 10 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 21 August 2000: Standard registration
- 17 January 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CHIK (Working name)
- COMMUNITY HEALTH IN KEYHAM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £26.44k | £34.20k | £53.43k | £47.93k | £36.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £34.95k | £30.00k | £43.82k | £53.11k | £51.13k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £25.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | £9.16k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 14 January 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 19 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 19 January 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 JULY 2000. AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11 APR 2018
Charitable objects
THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE INHABITANTS OF KEYHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (THE AREA OF BENEFIT). THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
KEYHAM AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, DEVON.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window