PARENTS, FRIENDS & FAMILY OF CHANTRY (PFF)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a Parent Teacher Association and fundraises by running events such as seasonal fairs and school discos in order to generate funds to purchase items for the benefit of the primary school that it supports.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- East Sussex
Governance
- 24 November 1999: Standard registration
- CHANTRY COMMUNITY PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maxine Wells | Chair | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hazel Ansell | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Bowles | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrea Richards | Trustee | 03 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
REBECCA MARY REED | Trustee | 23 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.53k | £2.13k | £50 | £296 | £7.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.36k | £4.26k | £306 | £1.42k | £3.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 31 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 19 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 17 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 03 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 19 OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Chantry Cp School
Barrack Road
BEXHILL-ON-SEA
TN40 2AT
- Phone:
- 01424211696
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window