THE VACATIONAL STUDIES FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assistance with educational scholarships
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 January 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Matthew Debney | Chair | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pedro Mol | Trustee | 01 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Philip Kefford | Trustee | 20 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Hugh Irving | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Dell | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Yannick Mol | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Matthew Geoffrey Darrah Jamieson | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
Dr GEORGE HOUPIS | Trustee |
|
||||||
ELIZABETH SYBIL USSHER COOKE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JESUS SILVA FERNANDEZ | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PROFESSOR EBERHARD WEISE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FRANCIS JOHN MCIVOR | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.50k | £0 | £0 | £4.90k | £10.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.50k | £0 | £0 | £4.90k | £10.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE ON 14 DECEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF AMENDMENT 17 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE OF ALL NATIONALITIES STILL IN FULL TIME EDUCATION AND INCLUDING YOUNG PEOPLE FROM LESS PRIVILEGED CIRCUMSTANCES OR BACKGROUNDS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS (WORLDWIDE)
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Ranmoor Chase
Riverdale Road
SHEFFIELD
S10 3FA
- Phone:
- 00447963719765
- Email:
- matthewjdebney@gmail.com
- Website:
-
foundation.vacationalstudies.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window