MILL GROVE CHRISTIAN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Care and support of children and families in need including residential accommodation, respite care, oversight of pre-school nursery and holidays, and other community activities, in the context of family and unconditional love.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Redbridge
Governance
- 17 December 1999: Standard registration
- 10 June 2016: Funds received from 1029790 ROSE WALTON CENTRE (FOR CEREBRAL PALSY CHILDREN)
- 12 September 2017: Funds received from 1049477 CHRISTIAN CHILD CARE FORUM
- 25 September 2017: Funds received from 299545 SOLENT MULTIPLE SCLEROSIS THERAPIES LTD
- 14 February 2018: Funds received from 272245 G M T EVANGELICAL TRUST LIMITED
- 01 April 2021: Funds received from 293585 THE WOODFORD WELLS ECUMENICAL CHURCH TRUST
- MILL GROVE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Keith John White | Chair | 12 March 1971 |
|
|||||||||
Lynn Jennifer Cadman | Trustee | 11 April 2024 |
|
|
||||||||
David Mark Small | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
Stephen Campbell Small | Trustee | 14 March 2020 |
|
|
||||||||
RICHARD WILLIAM BLACKHURST | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|||||||||
Dr JUDITH HELEN LITTLEJOHN | Trustee | 24 April 2012 |
|
|
||||||||
ANDREW PLOWMAN | Trustee | 12 March 1993 |
|
|||||||||
MONICA RUTH WHITE | Trustee | 12 March 1976 |
|
|
||||||||
MARTIN JOHN WESTBROOK | Trustee | 12 March 1976 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £347.06k | £311.65k | £306.05k | £357.51k | £398.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £331.40k | £284.64k | £334.84k | £402.36k | £372.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £8.48k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14TH SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
(A) TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS DISTRESS AND SUFFERING IN PARTICULAR AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES WHO ARE IN NEED BY PROVIDING:(1) ACCOMMODATION BOTH LONG-TERM AND SHORT-TERM (2) SUPPORT AND CARE INCLUDING DAY CARE FOR CHILDREN AND FAMILIES (3) SUPPORT FOR PERSONS AFTER HAVING LEFT ACCOMMODATION PROVIDED BY THE TRUST (4) A NETWORK OF INFORMATION AND RESOURCES (B) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN PARTICULAR ABOUT THE NEEDS OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES (C) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN PARTICULAR BY INTRODUCING CHILDREN YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES TO JESUS CHRIST AND CONDUCTING THE WORK OF THE TRUST IN SUCH A WAY AS TO BE A LIVING TESTIMONY TO THE POWER AND CARE OF GOD BY TRUSTING GOD ALONE TO PROVIDE RESOURCES FOR THE WORK.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 CRESCENT ROAD
SOUTH WOODFORD
LONDON
E18 1JB
- Phone:
- 02085042702
- Email:
- Millgrove@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window