THE BARBARA PISARSKA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
During the year ended 31/3/09 we purchased a Cardiomonitor for Dzieciatka Jesus Hospital in Warsaw. A grant was given to Teresa Pisarska-Markiewicz towards the cost of medical bills. In conjunction with staff of the Bank of New York Mellon London offices a sum of -ú1000 was raised for a special bed for Mr T Thandi of East london.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Poland
Governance
- 06 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grazyna Ewa Tarnowska | Trustee | 10 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alicja Turowska | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bozena Pol | Trustee | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr BEATA BARBARA PISARSKA-PIESSE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GLENN WILLIAM PIESSE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £497 | £126 | £287 | £17 | £86 | |
|
Total expenditure | £36 | £0 | £500 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 13 May 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 MARCH 2000 AND AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 25 DAY OF MARCH 2003 AND 20 AUGUST 2007
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN SICKNESS WHEREVER IN THE WORLD BY PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND OTHER SUPPORT IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE. TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CHILDREN WHO ARE RESIDENTS OF THE HOME KNOWN AS 'WARSAW CHILDREN'S HOME NUMBER 3' IN WARSAW, THE CHILDREN OF FORMER RESIDENTS OF THE HOME KNOWN AS ''WARSAW CHILDREN'S HOME NUMBER 3'' IN WARSAW, AND THE STUDENTS AT SZKOLA PODSTAWOWA NIEPUBLICZNA NUMBER 74, UL. SMOLENSKIEGO 31, IM. BLOGOSLAWIONEGO HONORATA KOZMINSKIEGO, IN PARTICULAR BY ADVANCING THEIR EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
POLAND AND WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
38 COBURG PLACE
SOUTH WOODHAM FERRERS
CHELMSFORD
CM3 5LY
- Phone:
- 01245323655
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window