UNITED CHURCH OF GOD BRITISH ISLES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Religious activities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 31 January 2000: Standard registration
- THE GOOD NEWS - A MAGAZINE OF UNDERSTANDING (Working name)
- THE WORLD TOMORROW PROGRAMME (Working name)
- UNITED CHURCH OF GOD BIBLE STUDY COURSE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jason Godfrey | Chair | 07 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debi Richardson | Trustee | 31 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
BRYAN THOMAS ELLAMS | Trustee | 21 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Brian Crook | Trustee | 31 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID NORMAN FENNEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £246.59k | £252.52k | £329.18k | £245.04k | £283.24k | |
|
Total expenditure | £262.17k | £216.42k | £224.21k | £223.06k | £308.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 11 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 19 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 03 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 07 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 04 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO PREACH THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST AND THE KINGDOM OF GOD IN THE BRITISH ISLES AND IN THE WORLD AT LARGE, MAKE DISCIPLES IN ALL NATIONS AND PASTOR AND CARE FOR THOSE DISCIPLES
Area of benefit
WORLD WIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNITED CHURCH OF GOD
PETERSON HOUSE
THE GREEN
HIGH STREET
CHALFONT ST. GILES
HP8 4QF
- Phone:
- 01494875003
- Email:
- info@ucg.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window