Accounts and annual returns FREEDOM STREET

Charity number: 1079170
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2010 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 Not submitted
Annual return 31 July 2009 23 February 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2009 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2008 19 May 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2007 25 February 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2006 06 February 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2006 06 February 2007 On Time