Financial history CUMBRIA WASTE MANAGEMENT ENVIRONMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1090965
Charity reporting is overdue by 100 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £338.24k £313.50k £257.32k £427.15k £385.66k
Total expenditure £492.23k £320.28k £246.40k £304.46k £261.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A