GLASSHOUGHTON COMMUNITY FORUM LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Health and wellbeing, sport and physical exercise, dance and drama, education, children and families projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 18 October 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ERIC JONES | Chair |
|
|
|||||
George Jackson | Trustee | 10 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW Carney | Trustee | 01 May 2017 |
|
|
||||
Richard Forster | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|||||
Denise Jeffery | Trustee | 03 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY WALLIS | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
TONY GALE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £107.61k | £134.64k | £138.89k | £110.92k | £108.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £139.19k | £148.08k | £163.74k | £159.55k | £163.87k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £81.90k | £29.27k | £15.85k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 14 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
14 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 March 2024 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 25 February 2021 | 25 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 AUGUST 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED JULY 2001.
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF GLASSHOUGHTON AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION. RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATION IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 2) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
CASTLEFORD, WAKEFIELD DISTRICT, WEST YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARRICA
WESTFIELD AVENUE
CASTLEFORD
WF10 5JJ
- Phone:
- 01977514157
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window