THE BURFORD BENEFICE BARTHOLOMEW TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the Trust are the advancement of the Christian religion and the advancement of education and such other charitable purposes beneficial to the community as the Trustees shall decide in The Benefice of Burford with Fulbrook, Taynton, Asthall, Swinbrook and Widford all in the County of Oxfordshire and elsewhere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 18 February 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon Polito | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
Lyn Bibbings Burns | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
Rev Thomas David Putt | Trustee | 26 October 2019 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||
Ruth Ellen McCalman | Trustee | 08 February 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||
IVAN HALL | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.98k | £1.36k | £10.00k | £15.21k | £5.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.04k | £5.71k | £4.97k | £4.36k | £26.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 22 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 04 March 2024 | 125 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION ON 20 JANUARY 2000
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION/AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE IN THE BENEFICE OF BURFORD WITH FULBROOK, TAYNTON, ASTHALL, SWINBROOK AND WIDFORD ALL IN THE COUNTY OF OXFORDSHIRE ("THE BENEFICE") AND ELSEWHERE THE TRUSTEES MUST USE THE INCOME AND MAY USE THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST IN PROMOTING THE OBJECTS
Area of benefit
BURFORD, FULBROOK, TAYNTON, ASTHALL, SWINBROOK AND WIDFORD ALL IN THE COUNTY OF OXFORDSHIRE AND ELSWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Orchard Rise
Burford
OX18 4SZ
- Phone:
- 07884273460
- Email:
- ivan.hall45@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window