PLYMOUTH CITY MISSION TRUST LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The financing of the religious and charitable work Plymouth City Mission:the telephone helpline (in conjunction with the National Christian Helplines) and counselling work of the Crossline project
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cornwall
- Devon
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 06 April 2000: Standard registration
- 11 July 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- CROSSLINE (Working name)
- PLYMOUTH CITY MISSION (Working name)
- RAHAB (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £18.66k | £12.71k | £12.81k | £17.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.08k | £18.31k | £15.28k | £15.95k | £17.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 14 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 6 AUGUST 1952 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 25 APRIL 1994, 24 APRIL 1995 AND 14 JULY 1997. as amended on 15 Jun 2021
Charitable objects
The only objects for which the Charity is established are: (1) to extend the knowledge of the Christian Gospel among the inhabitants of Plymouth and its vicinity (especially the poor) without any reference to denominational distinctions or peculiarities of Church government; and (2) for the relief of persons in charitable need in particular but not exclusively through the provision of counselling and such other support and assistance as will improve their physical, emotional, mental and spiritual well-being
Area of benefit
PLYMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window