LYMINGTON SAILABILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing sailing and power boating for disabled people both in the Lymington River and on the Solent
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hampshire
Governance
- 21 January 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gordon Munro | Trustee | 09 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
VINCENT JOHN GANDER | Trustee | 17 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
THOMAS MORTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.24k | £3.29k | £40.86k | £3.06k | £24.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.48k | £11.98k | £14.48k | £16.24k | £14.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 14 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 20 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 20 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 30 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF DISABLED PERSONS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL SAILING.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE LYMINGTON AND RINGWOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Royal Lymington Yacht Club
Bath Road
LYMINGTON
SO41 3SE
- Phone:
- 07836225435
- Email:
- lymsailability@gmail.com
- Website:
-
lymingtonsailability.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window