ST. SAVIOUR'S PRE - SCHOOL, GREAT SUTTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide education and training to children from 2-4 years of age who are resident in the area of Cheshire West and Chester (formerly Ellesmere Port and Neston).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £78,623 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 09 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Craig Anthony Lewis | Chair | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Hanna Gushlow | Trustee | 04 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie M Seymour | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
WINIFRED MARY GAVIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS WIN GAVIN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.95k | £51.34k | £40.46k | £53.64k | £92.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.43k | £45.15k | £51.32k | £48.68k | £76.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £42.97k | £33.31k | £41.54k | £78.62k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 11 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 03 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 05 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 02 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 JUNE 1999 AS AMENDED 18 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
122 GREEN LANE
GREAT SUTTON
ELLESMERE PORT
CH66 4XG
- Phone:
- 07855 145656
- Email:
- wingavin@lineone.net
- Website:
-
facebook
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window