Financial history KINGSTON GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1078461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £16.69m £16.54m £19.40m £19.22m £22.07m
Total expenditure £15.08m £14.79m £16.81m £17.92m £19.80m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £433.00k £143.00k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £217.00k £208.00k £1.21m £107.00k £784.00k
Income - Other trading activities £186.00k £102.00k £804.00k £512.00k £549.00k
Income - Charitable activities £15.67m £15.92m £17.30m £18.21m £20.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £125.00k £1.00m £0 £0
Income - Investment £119.00k £64.00k £84.00k £391.00k £609.00k
Income - Other £499.00k £249.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £14.18m £14.03m £16.09m £17.35m £19.26m
Expenditure - Raising funds £210.00k £162.00k £99.00k £93.00k £135.00k
Expenditure - Governance £19.00k £33.00k £35.00k £40.00k £50.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £19.00k £18.00k £20.00k £20.00k £31.00k
Expenditure - Other £690.00k £600.00k £623.00k £470.00k £402.00k