ST. STEPHEN'S HOUSE (GLOUCESTER ROAD) LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grant Funding and Property Management
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 January 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JAMES DAY | Chair | 26 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
ERIC WILLIAM BURTIN FRIPP | Trustee | 21 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jack Ralph Hodsoll | Trustee | 12 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Alexander Fox | Trustee | 08 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Zarina Membery | Trustee | 12 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rev ROGER PREECE | Trustee | 26 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £428.36k | £306.33k | £298.38k | £308.78k | £331.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.87k | £286.50k | £281.64k | £527.00k | £332.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 05 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 15 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 19 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 08 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 13 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
(1) THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A CHURCH HALL FOR FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. STEPHEN, GLOUCESTER ROAD; AND (2) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ACCORD WITH THE CATHOLIC PRACTICE AND TEACHING OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AS THE INCUMBENT FOR THE TIME BEING OF THE BENEFICE OF ST. STEPHENS, GLOUCESTER ROAD SHALL SPECIFY FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. STEPHEN, GLOUCESTER ROAD (SOUTH WEST LONDON)
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. STEPHENS CHURCH
SOUTHWELL GARDENS
LONDON
SW7 4RL
- Phone:
- 02073703418
- Email:
- saint.stephen@homecall.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window