BRENTHAM SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The aims of the Society are to advance the education of the general public in the heritage, architecture and development of Brentham Garden Suburb, in particular by the collection and preservation of photographs, documents, films and other artefacts that relate to the history, architecture or development of Brentham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Ealing
Governance
- 07 March 2000: Standard registration
- BRENTHAM HERITAGE SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jo Bradley | Chair | 26 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Tamara Colton | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Isabel Castellano | Trustee | 31 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Salord | Trustee | 30 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Henderson | Trustee | 14 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN JOHN MORTIMORE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.36k | £3.37k | £3.47k | £5.28k | £5.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.65k | £2.59k | £2.51k | £8.25k | £5.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 31 August 2024 | 62 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 13 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 24 July 2020 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12TH OCTOBER 1999, AS AMENDED 27TH FEBRUARY 2000 AND 12TH FEBRUARY 2009 AND 22 OCTOBER 2009
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN BRENTHAM GARDEN SUBURB, (A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST AND CARE FOR THE AMENITY, BEAUTY AND CHARACTER OF BRENTHAM GARDEN SUBURB (B) TO PRESERVE, PROTECT AND IMPROVE THE AMENITY, BEAUTY AND CHARACTER OF BRENTHAM GARDEN SUBURB, INCLUDING THE FEATURES OF HISTORIC, ARCHITECTURAL, LANDSCAPE AND PUBLIC INTEREST THERE (C) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN BRENTHAM GARDEN SUBURB (D) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE HERITAGE, ARCHITECTURE AND DEVELOPMENT OF BRENTHAM GARDEN SUBURB, IN PARTICULAR BY THE COLLECTION AND PRESERVATION OF PHOTOGRAPHS, DOCUMENTS, FILMS AND OTHER ARTEFACTS THAT RELATE TO THE HISTORY, ARCHITECTURE OR DEVELOPMENT OF BRENTHAM GARDEN SUBURB
Area of benefit
BRENTHAM GARDEN SUBURB
Contact information
- Address:
-
3rd Floor Brentham Club
38A Meadvale Road
LONDON
W5 1NP
- Phone:
- 02083571396
- Email:
- secretary@brentham.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window