Financial history THORNHILL LEES COMMUNITY CENTRE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1078818
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £18.13k £12.10k £29.45k £18.04k £26.51k
Total expenditure £20.00k £8.50k £32.05k £26.60k £25.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A £15.74k N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £1.30k N/A £4.10k £5.65k