Financial history NORTHERN REFUGEE CENTRE

Charity number: 1078816
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £1.18m £1.06m £505.98k £670.35k £1.22m
Total expenditure £1.01m £899.84k £587.01k £829.38k £1.12m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £0 £1.87k £1.68k £1.06k £2.54k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £1.04m £1.04m £485.93k £648.86k £1.09m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £594 £1.53k £700 £545
Income - Other £140.73k £19.19k £16.86k £19.73k £126.36k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £887.64k £1.04m £500.00k £730.33k £978.98k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £121.42k £0 £87.01k £99.05k £141.01k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0