Accounts and annual returns ASPHALEIA ACTION

Charity number: 1081728
Charity reporting is up to date (102 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 January 2024 05 March 2025 95 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2024 12 March 2025 102 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 January 2023 07 May 2024 159 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 January 2022 27 March 2023 117 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 January 2022 27 March 2023 117 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 July 2020 15 June 2021 16 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2020 15 June 2021 16 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 July 2019 18 August 2020 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 July 2019 18 August 2020 80 days late Download Open in new window