COMMUNITY CONNECT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The key activities of the organisation are: -++? Education and Training -++? Skills Development Activities -++? Health Development Activities -++? Adult Guidance -++? Employment Support -++? ICT and Internet access facility -++? Youth Engagement -++? Research & Development
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £25,249 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
13 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Sandwell
Governance
- 14 November 2000: Standard registration
- SBYF (Working name)
- SMETHWICK BANGLADESHI YOUTH FORUM (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shomsur Khan | Trustee | 09 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Taz Uddin | Trustee | 13 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
SALAH UDDIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ZAMAL AHMED | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KOBI MIAH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NASIR UDDIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ABDUR ROHMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BASHIR AHMED MBE | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £196.51k | £150.76k | £292.07k | £238.34k | £271.55k | |
|
Total expenditure | £177.38k | £138.21k | £181.57k | £225.84k | £260.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £4.57k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.33k | N/A | £19.51k | £25.25k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 23 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 April 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2022
(These accounts |
03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/06/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 24/08/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 07/09/2011
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE COMMUNITY WITHIN THE WEST MIDLANDS WITH A PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE DISTRICT OF SMETHWICK AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FORGOING, DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO BANGLADESHI'S RESIDING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS, TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF SANDWELL WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE DISTRICTOF SMETHWICK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
North Smethwick Resource Centre
Cambridge Road
Smethwick
B66 2HR
- Phone:
- 01215653311
- Email:
- info@ccfoundation.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window