TRANSFORM AFRICA
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work with and strengthen local organisations and communities in Africa to enable them to effectively identify and tackle the root causes of poverty, social and economic injusticies and disease in their communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
Total income includes £72,712 from 1 government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Islington
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Sierra Leone
- Tanzania
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 28 July 2000: Standard registration
- 15 February 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £365.53k | £206.74k | £162.59k | £204.56k | £158.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £432.91k | £250.69k | £201.56k | £159.10k | £249.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | £98.48k | £72.71k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 22 July 2022 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 24 July 2020 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2018 | 02 July 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2018 | 02 July 2019 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 AUGUST 1999 AND AMENDED 17 MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN RELIEVING POVERTY AND SICKNESS IN AFRICA AND ELSEWHERE PARTICULARLY BY PROMOTING FORMS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT; AND TO ASSIST IN ADVANCING EDUCATION IN SUCH COUNTRIES
Area of benefit
AFRICA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window