Trustees KING GEORGE'S FIELD (FULMER)
Charity number: 1081464

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Pelton | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Walsh | Trustee | 04 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Namit Pandey | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Sophia Deanne McKenzie | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Ann Vahey | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lorette du Toit | Trustee | 16 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Roy Alexander MacMillan | Trustee | 22 April 2009 |
|
|
||||
Peter Box | Trustee | 21 March 2008 |
|
|
||||
FULMER PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.