ETTINGTON COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of community facilities to the Parish of Ettington & wider community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Warwickshire
Governance
- 08 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH CATHERINE LYALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
DAVID HUGHES | Trustee | 12 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
ETTINGTON PARISH COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN THOMAS KENDRICK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.29k | £44.98k | £75.50k | £41.09k | £43.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.53k | £21.95k | £48.70k | £52.79k | £51.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £40.95k | £40.86k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF ETTINGTON AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD [HEREINAFTER CALLED " THE AREA OF BENEFIT"] WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION INCLUDING THE PLAYING OF ALL TYPES OF SPORT ["THE FACILITIES"] WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS; TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE ["THE CENTRE"] AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME [WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON, SUB-COMMITTEE OR BODY] IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE A PUBLIC RECREATION GROUND AND PLAYING FIELD FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF ETTINGTON AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD [" THE BENEFICIARIES OF THE CHARITY"]
Area of benefit
PARISH OF ETTINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ettington Community Centre
Rogers Lane
Ettington
STRATFORD-UPON-AVON
CV37 7SX
- Phone:
- 07975 682 775
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window