ONE IN FOUR (LONDON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support for the relief of the mental and physical distress of people who have experienced sexual abuse and to provide the advancement of education of the public in the nature of sexual abuse and its effect on those who have been subject to it. These services are mainly provided through therapeutic counselling,training and advocacy and collaborative work with relevant other agencies.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Kent
- Surrey
- Throughout London
Governance
- 25 July 2000: Standard registration
- ONE IN FOUR (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Claire Louise Libbey | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Laura Foster | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Gordon McConnell | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nicole Yasin Burton | Trustee | 01 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Julia Herd | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Seema Sharma | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simon Silvester Cook | Trustee | 28 May 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTIANE SANDERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.13k | £380.16k | £266.52k | £176.97k | £292.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £189.41k | £304.35k | £301.93k | £241.33k | £244.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £28.31k | £5.00k | £44.10k | £6.06k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 05 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 29 JAN 1999 AS AMENDED ON 23 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED ON 21 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF THE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED SEXUAL ABUSE 2. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE NATURE OF SEXUAL ABUSE AND ITS AFFECT ON THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN SUBJECT TO IT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE GREATER LONDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ONE IN FOUR
219 BROMLEY ROAD
LONDON
SE6 2PG
- Phone:
- 02086972112
- Email:
- admin@oneinfour.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window