N.F.F.O TRAINING TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust was set up to promote and provide vocational training and to advance the education of the public in all matters related to the Fishing Industry.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 02 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ROBERT MARSH CASSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GARY HODGSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARRIE DEAS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £100.03k | £100.12k | £100.02k | £100.30k | £2.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.48k | £5.48k | £98.62k | £110.90k | £48.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 November 2024 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 146 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 25 March 2024 | 146 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 November 2021 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 25 OCTOBER 1999
Charitable objects
SHALL BE TO PROMOTE AND PROVIDE VOCATIONAL TRAINING AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATED TO THE FISHING INDUSTRY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
21 GEORGE STREET
YORK
YO1 9QA
- Phone:
- 01904635430
- Email:
- michael@nffo.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window