THE FRIENDS OF THE ROSE BOWL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To support the Rose Bowl Youth Club, Marquess Estate, Islington N1 or otherwise the youth of Islington to advance education and personal development and to provide facilities for recreation in the interest of social welfare.The aim is to provide facilities such as computers, arts, sports and musical equipment,and to provide funding so that the youth club is open for more sessions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Islington
Governance
- 29 January 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sylvana Caloni | Chair | 25 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Laura Nyavie | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Elena Barakos | Trustee | 11 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Maria Marinos | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Owayes Ayad | Trustee | 02 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tessa Elizabeth Warren | Trustee | 04 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
Oswin James Baker | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Michael O'Donnell | Trustee | 24 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
GORDON GEDDES | Trustee | 24 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Dawn Marie Brindle | Trustee | 02 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.83k | £64.49k | £54.53k | £78.61k | £96.01k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.26k | £56.96k | £57.74k | £73.10k | £78.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 01 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 3 NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION ARE TO HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE ROSE BOWL YOUTH CLUB SITUATED IN THE ROSE BOWL BUILDING, ST PAUL'S OPEN SPACE, MARQUESS ROAD, LONDON N1 (CODE) OR OTHERWISE FOR THE YOUTH OF ISLINGTON TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE
Area of benefit
ISLINGTON, LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
6
Alwyne Road
London
Islington
N1 2HH
- Phone:
- 020 7226 3611
- Website:
-
friendsoftherosebowl.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window