Accounts and annual returns (HASTE) HELP AFRICAN SCHOOLS TO EDUCATE

Charity number: 1080489
Charity reporting is overdue by 1500 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 39 days
Annual return 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 404 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 404 days
Annual return 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 770 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 770 days
Annual return 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1135 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1135 days
Annual return 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1500 days
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1500 days