THE LAURIN AND ARTHUR GLAZE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY OFFERS ONE SCHOLARSHIP PER ANNUM TO A POST GRADUATE MUSIC STUDENT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 09 February 2000: Standard registration
- THE LAURIN AND ARTHUR GLAZE TRUST (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JANET ELISABETH HOLLAND | Chair | 26 November 1999 |
|
|
||||
PAUL ALLATT | Trustee | 12 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
RITA IVY MARSON | Trustee | 16 February 2006 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.90k | £10.54k | £15.00k | £4.92k | £7.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.00k | £10.01k | £11.09k | £11.06k | £11.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 24 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 02 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 17 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26TH NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED 25 JUNE 2007.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY MEANS OF A MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP TO A PERSON WHO IS ORDINARILY RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT ON AN ANNUAL BASIS PROVIDED THAT IN THE UNFETTERED OPINION OF THE TRUSTEES WHERE THERE IS NO SUITABLE APPLICANT IN ANY ONE YEAR TO BE ABLE TO ACCUMULATE BOTH CAPITAL AND INCOME OF THE TRUST UNTIL SUCH TIME AS A SUITABLE APPLICANT BECOMES AVAILABLE. (IF NO SUCH SUITABLE CANDIDATE IS FOUND THEN A MUSICAL SCHOLARSHIP MAY BE PROVIDED TO A PERSON WHO RESIDES ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.)
Area of benefit
THE ADMINISTRATIVE AREA OF ESSEX COUNTY COUNCIL TOGETHER WITH THE ADMINISTRATIVE AREAS OF THE LONDON BOROUGHS OF WALTHAM FOREST, NEWHAM REDBRIDGE AND BARKING AND DAGENHAM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 YEOVILTON PLACE
KINGSTON UPON THAMES
KT2 5GP
- Phone:
- 02085491641
- Email:
- PAULALLATT@VIRGINMEDIA.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window