CITIZENS ADVICE DAVENTRY AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 1078687
Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of advice & information on a broad range of subjects to the general public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022

Total income: £241,124
Total expenditure: £237,668

Fundraising

This charity raises funds from the public but does not work with professional fundraisers or commercial participators.

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 21 December 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • DAVENTRY AND DISTRICT CAB (Working name)
  • ADVICE DAVENTRY (Previous name)
  • DAVENTRY AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOHN EDWIN DONOVAN Chair
None on record
Rosie Humphreys Trustee 27 April 2021
None on record
Dr Virginia Hayden Trustee 21 April 2020
None on record
Peter Nigel Matten Trustee 24 July 2018
None on record
GLORIA EDWARDS-DAVIDSON Trustee
None on record
IAN CLARKE Trustee
None on record
CLIVE ALAN BROWN Trustee
None on record
STEPHEN HUPFIELD Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £135.53k £156.80k £238.20k £264.96k £241.12k
Total expenditure £145.64k £163.70k £225.71k £245.75k £237.67k
Income from government contracts £68.00k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £17.79k £111.10k N/A £139.36k £121.22k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days
Annual return 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 23 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 23 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 09 November 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Daventry & District Citizens Advice
Bureau
The Abbey
Market Square
DAVENTRY
NN11 4XG
Phone:
01327701644