BAWSO LTD

Charity number: 1084854

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

i)To relieve the needs of people from minority ethnic communities who have suffered from domestic abuse including other forms of violence by the provision of temporary accommodation in Wales. ii)To provide specialist support to people from minority ethnic communities. iii)To advance the education of the general public concerning the needs of such people from minority ethnic communities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 01 February 2001: Standard registration
  • 03 June 2013: Funds received from 1066735 MEWN CYMRU, A NETWORK OF BLACK AND MINORITY ETHNIC...
  • 16 June 2017: Funds received from 1147392 CARMARTHENSHIRE DOMESTIC ABUSE FORUM LIMITED
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • BAWSO (Working name)
  • BAWSO LTD (Working name)
  • BAWSO WOMENS AID (Working name)
  • BAWSO WOMEN'S AID (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Carol Harris Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Vimlaben Patel Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Temmy Woolston Trustee 12 December 2024
None on record
Mutale Merrill OBE Trustee 31 January 2023
SUB-SAHARA ADVISORY PANEL
Received: On time
Giovanni Riva Trustee 29 January 2021
None on record
Pauline Walker Trustee 26 November 2019
None on record
Rachel McDonald Trustee 26 November 2019
None on record
Mwape Burke Trustee 26 November 2019
None on record
Michael Murray Trustee 28 February 2019
None on record
JENNIFER FLETCHER BA Trustee 31 January 2012
None on record
TAHMINA KHAN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.22m £3.84m £4.66m £4.71m £4.48m
Total expenditure £3.13m £3.63m £4.19m £4.17m £4.67m
Income from government contracts N/A £1.41m £1.75m £2.01m £1.98m
Income from government grants £1.89m £208.99k £1.30m £1.89m £1.60m
Income - Donations and legacies £710.51k £853.38k £12.42k £14.26k £12.75k
Income - Other trading activities £18.52k £7.18k £8.56k £24.26k £14.90k
Income - Charitable activities £2.49m £2.97m £4.64m £4.67m £4.44m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11 £4.19k £50 £3.34k £11.43k
Income - Other £4.10k £8.46k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.13m £3.63m £4.19m £4.17m £4.67m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £12.36k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £596.60k £619.21k £653.51k £825.10k £856.56k
Long-term investments £0 £1 £1 £1 £1
Other assets £519.02k £1.07m £1.35m £1.68m £1.59m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £373.84k £730.85k £583.13k £545.01k £682.63k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Unit 4
Sovereign Quay
Havannah Street
CARDIFF
Phone:
02920644633