Governing document THE BRITISH ASSOCIATION OF BARBERSHOP SINGERS
Charity number: 1080930

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - ASSOCIATION CONVERSION DATED 26 NOV 2020 as amended on 08 Apr 2022 as amended on 05 Jul 2022 as amended on 17 Mar 2023 as amended on 01 Oct 2023
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ANY AND ALL ASPECTS OF BARBERSHOP HARMONY (AS DEFINED IN THE APPENDIX TO THE MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES) AND SINGING IN THE BARBERSHOP HARMONY STYLE ("THE OBJECTS")
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.