WILLERBY CARR LANE PRIMARY PFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a parents and friends association who organise and run events for our school community with the purpose of raising funds to enhance the school environment for the children.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Other Charitable Activities
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 25 April 2000: Standard registration
- FRIENDS OF CARR LANE JUNIOR SCHOOL (Previous name)
- FRIENDS OF WILLERBY CARR LANE JUNIOR SCHOOL (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Pinchbeck | Chair | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
william Roantree | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Sullivan | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
leanne labrom | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Chamberlain | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Foster | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.86k | £3.96k | £11.95k | £12.88k | £15.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.45k | £4.23k | £6.94k | £24.25k | £13.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 23 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13/10/1999 AS AMENDED ON 14/03/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Willerby Carr Lane Primary School
Carr Lane
Willerby
Hull
HU10 6JT
- Phone:
- 01482653388
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window