Trustees WILLERBY CARR LANE PRIMARY PFA
Charity Number: 1080417

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Pinchbeck | Chair | 29 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
william Roantree | Trustee | 17 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julia Sullivan | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
leanne labrom | Trustee | 30 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Helen Chamberlain | Trustee | 01 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Foster | Trustee | 01 June 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.