NORTH EAST AMBULANCE SERVICE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 1078575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The main purpose of the charitable funds held on trust is to apply income for any charitable purpose relating to the National Health Service wholly or mainly for the services provided by the North East Ambulance Service

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £205,259
Total expenditure: £118,434

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 December 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
North East Ambulance Service NHS Foundation Trust Trustee 01 October 1999
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.04k £190.28k £24.80k £244.18k £205.26k
Total expenditure £18.46k £89.13k £123.00k £222.24k £118.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £90.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 28 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS BY THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT FOR USE BY NORTH EAST AMBULANCE SERVICE NHS TRUST
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 13 December 1999 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
North East Ambulance Service NHS Tr
Trust
Bernicia House
The Waterfront
Goldcrest Way
NEWCASTL
Phone:
01914302000