BILL HILL CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of poverty and the promotion of the Christian religion in the London borough of Newham.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Newham
Governance
- 08 November 2006: Standard registration
- 10 October 2023: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 10 October 2023: Funds transferred to 1069248 EAST 13 CHRISTIAN TRUST
- TIMMS CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.25k | £4.04k | £2.47k | £2.03k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £65.87k | £41.38k | £47.70k | £30.14k | £65.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE 24 NOVEMBER 1999 AND SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 27 JUNE 2007
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AMONG PEOPLE RESIDING IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM
Area of benefit
THE LONDON BOROUGH OF NEWHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window