DISABILITY DIRECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Disability Direct is a support service for disabled people. We are also an umbrella agency for smaller groups of disabled people. We are an organisation of disabled people and currently employ 14 paid staff and 35 volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,254,872
Donations and legacies | £8.04k | |
Charitable activities | £320.64k | |
Other trading activities | £2.82m | |
Investments | £109.22k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£3,123,204
Raising funds | £1.96m | |
Charitable activities | £1.16m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.96m | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.16m | |
Retained for future use | £131.67k |
People

70 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnet
- Derbyshire
- Kent
- Nottinghamshire
- Rutland
- Surrey
- Wigan
Governance
- 13 March 2000: Standard registration
- 10 April 2012: Funds received from 1013873 DERBY COMMUNITY TRANSPORT
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robin Wood | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Candice Ridley | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Adarsh Batra | Trustee | 16 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Amin Saquib | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rajvinder Gharmount | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Peter Aspey | Trustee | 20 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter Cade | Trustee | 01 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dominic Rees-Jones | Trustee | 01 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Simer Sall | Trustee | 01 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
DAVID MOSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.32m | £1.56m | £1.51m | £2.37m | £3.25m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.34m | £1.37m | £1.42m | £1.98m | £3.12m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £70.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £53.75k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £9.61k | £6.28k | £1.95k | £2.51k | £8.04k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.21m | £1.05m | £1.28m | £1.99m | £2.82m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £60.75k | £479.45k | £177.82k | £312.29k | £320.64k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £41.46k | £21.20k | £32.14k | £55.05k | £109.22k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £177 | £18.54k | £6.18k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £591.62k | £675.70k | £645.88k | £738.80k | £1.16m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £743.56k | £690.96k | £778.30k | £1.24m | £1.96m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £8.53k | £8.85k | £14.00k | £17.05k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £590.39k | £537.50k | £488.15k | £440.21k | £416.16k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £301.36k | £380.73k | £486.76k | £914.18k | £1.04m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £252.73k | £86.69k | £53.78k | £44.18k | £68.06k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 February 2024 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 March 2022 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 10 February 2021 | 10 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 March 2021 | 58 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMO AND ARTS INCORPORATED 9 DECEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY WRITTEN RESOLUTION 13 FEBRUARY 2000 AND 27 JULY 2000 AS AMENDED 27 APRIL 2007
Charitable objects
SHALL BE TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR DISABLED PEOPLE IN DERBY AND IN THE SURROUNDING REGIONS, BY THE PROVISION OF, BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION: A DROP IN CENTRE TO FACILITATE INDEPENDENT LIVING OPPORTUNITIES AND INFORMATION AND ADVICE WHICH DIRECTLY RELIEVES THE NEED OF THE BENEFICIARIES WHETHER THEY HAVE A LEARNING DIFFICULTY OR PHYSICAL OR SENSORY IMPAIRMENT AND IDENTIFICATION AND DEVELOPMENT OF NEW SERVICES WHICH EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY FACILITATES DISABLED PEOPLE'S ABILITY TO LIVE INDEPENDENTLY.
Area of benefit
DERBY AND IN THE SURROUNDING REGIONS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Disability Direct
The Richard Shaw Centre
20 Royal Scot Road, Pride Park
DERBY
DE24 8AJ
- Phone:
- 01332404040
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window