THE LISTEN CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise funds to relieve the distress and hardship of, and to promote the welfare of, children and young people throughout the world. Additionally, the charity intends to further public awareness of the nature, causes and effect of distress hardship and poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 February 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Yvonne Bezerra de Mello | Trustee | 14 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Ruchira Gupta | Trustee | 14 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Molly Bingham | Trustee | 01 November 2015 |
|
|
||||
Lord Peter Hain | Trustee | 22 October 2014 |
|
|||||
STEVEN SALTZMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SCOTT LANPHERE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £551 | £550 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 28 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 May 2023 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/03/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/12/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29/11/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/05/2009 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16/10/2014 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06 OCT 2015
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, FOR THE BENEFIT OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE: FOR RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMPANY MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
19 CHURCH ROAD
LONDON
SW13 9HE
- Phone:
- 02089396464
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window