THE RICKMANSWORTH SCHOOL FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To raise money to further the education of students attending Rickmansworth School
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £2,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 16 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Fletcher | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|||||
Simon White | Trustee | 19 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Walker | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN DE BRAUX | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
HARVEY ALAN FREDERICK COLLYER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £53.67k | £37.60k | £35.50k | £40.20k | £39.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.00k | £47.36k | £240 | £74.27k | £4.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 24 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 06/12/99
Charitable objects
(1) TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF STUDENTS ATTENDING RICKMANSWORTH SCHOOL; (2) TO PROVIDE RICKMANSWORTH SCHOOL WITH CAPITAL SUMS TO ENHANCE ITS PREMISES AND EQUIPMENT; (3) (A) TO AWARD SCHOLARSHIPS, EXHIBITIONS, BURSARIES AND MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO STUDENTS WHO ARE ATTENDING RICKMANSWORTH SCHOOL AND WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE; (3) (B) TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, OUTFITS, CLOTHING, TOOLS, INSTRUMENTS AND BOOKS TO SUCH PERSONS ON LEAVING RICKMANSWORTH SCHOOL TO PREPARE THEM FOR OR ASSIST THEIR ENTRY INTO A TRADE PROFESSION OR SERVICE; (3) (C) TO AWARD SUCH PERSONS GRANTS OR MAINTENANCE ALLOWANCES TO ENABLE THEM TO TRAVEL WHETHER IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ABROAD IN FURTHERANCE OF THEIR EDUCATION; AND (4) TO APPLY SUCH YEARLY SUMS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME PROVIDING SUCH SPECIAL BENEFITS OF A KIND NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR RICKMANSWORTH SCHOOL AS SHALL BE AGREED BETWEEN THE TRUSTEES AND THE GOVERNORS OF THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
RICKMANSWORTH
Contact information
- Address:
-
RICKMANSWORTH SCHOOL
SCOTS HILL
CROXLEY GREEN
RICKMANSWORTH
WD3 3AQ
- Phone:
- 01923773296
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window