BETEL OF BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Betel of Britain is a group of caring, not-for-profit Christian communities helping broken people to regain control of their health, work potential and independence. We provide accommodation free of addictive substances where people facing life-disrupting problems can regain control of their lives, in particular, through work experience in a caring family atmosphere.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£6,617,889
Donations and legacies | £3.18m | |
Charitable activities | £3.07m | |
Other trading activities | £286.18k | |
Investments | £8.90k | |
Other | £72.27k |
Total expenditure:
£5,066,721
Raising funds | £64.18k | |
Charitable activities | £5.00m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £64.18k | |
Charitable expenditure | £5.00m | |
Retained for future use | £1.55m |
People

5 Employee(s)
7 Trustee(s)
11 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 July 2000: Standard registration
- 15 November 2022: Funds received from 1136291 CITY CENTRE MINISTRIES MANCHESTER
- ANCHOR POINT (Working name)
- ANCHOR POINT EVENTS (Working name)
- ANCHORS AWEIGH SOFT PLAY (Working name)
- BETEL (Working name)
- BETEL CLEARANCES (Working name)
- BETEL GARDENS (Working name)
- BETEL TREEWORKS (Working name)
- BETEL UK (Working name)
- BETEL UK FURNITURE (Working name)
- INFINITE ARTS (Working name)
- ON POINT (Working name)
- RESTORED (Working name)
- RISING CAFE (Working name)
- RISING CAFE RESTAURANT (Working name)
- ANCHOR POINT (Previous name)
- ANCHOR POINT STYLES (Previous name)
- ANCHORS AWEIGH SOFT PLAY (Previous name)
- BETEL GARDENS (Previous name)
- BETEL OF BRITAIN (Previous name)
- BETEL OF BRITAIN (Previous name)
- BETEL OF BRITAIN (Previous name)
- BETEL UK FURNITURE (Previous name)
- BETEL, FURNITURE REVIVAL (BETEL'S), AYLESBURY HOUSE CLEARANCE AND ARK ANTIQUES (Previous name)
- INFINATE ARTS (Previous name)
- RISING CAFE (Previous name)
- RISING CAFE RESTAURANT (Previous name)
- More
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY JOHN BAGG | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Nicola Hickson | Trustee | 01 May 2020 |
|
|||||
YVONNE MOSQUITO | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|||||
Maurice Paul Reid | Trustee | 21 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
ELLIOTT TEPPER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY ALICE MARTIN | Trustee |
|
||||||
KENT MARTIN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.62m | £7.40m | £6.81m | £6.19m | £6.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.35m | £4.43m | £4.96m | £4.96m | £5.07m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £244.69k | £224.01k | £12.64k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.36m | £3.68m | £3.27m | £2.90m | £3.18m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £568.52k | £196.02k | £281.16k | £266.95k | £286.18k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.49m | £3.20m | £2.98m | £2.94m | £3.07m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.30k | £1.08k | £128 | £1.13k | £8.90k | |
|
Income - Other | £191.99k | £324.82k | £279.21k | £84.73k | £72.27k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.28m | £4.38m | £4.90m | £4.92m | £5.00m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £74.05k | £49.21k | £56.52k | £37.55k | £64.18k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £27.34k | £27.42k | £28.61k | £31.32k | £35.42k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £286.66k | £225.39k | £270.85k | £331.01k | £339.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £7.79m | £10.72m | £13.11m | £13.82m | £15.70m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.54m | £1.91m | £1.16m | £1.30m | £942.72k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £5.09m | £5.42m | £5.20m | £4.82m | £4.79m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 08 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 11 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 19 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED 22 OCTOBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 10TH DECEMBER 2001 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05/06/2015 as amended on 20 Aug 2018 as amended on 14 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
The Charity's Objects are the advancement of the Christian Faith and in particular, but without limitation, the relief of persons who are in condition of need, hardship or distress or who are aged or sick, and the restoration of persons who suffer from the effects of drug, alcohol or substance abuse, gambling and other addictions or who are homeless through the provision of accommodation and therapeutic work within the context of Christian residential communities.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Betel of Brtain
Anchor Point
58 Chester Street
Aston
BIRMINGHAM
B6 4BE
- Phone:
- 0121 5940650
- Email:
- info@betel.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window