TIDDLYWINKS CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Tiddlywinks Centre provides a local sustainable service, building a charitable business based on income generation which is not dependent on grant funding. We offer families living in Arbourthorne and surrounding areas of Sheffield quality childcare, and family support services. Providing services Monday to Friday, 8 am-6 pm, all year round to support families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 09 March 2000: Standard registration
- ARBOURTHORNE TIDDLY-WINKS CLUB (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Ann Talbot | Trustee | 22 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nadine Wynter | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Newton | Trustee | 17 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jim linfoot | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANICE ROBINSON | Trustee | 31 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Beattie | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £473.79k | £431.59k | £410.15k | £393.41k | £417.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £489.64k | £468.96k | £468.50k | £417.85k | £447.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £298.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 12 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JULY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 13 DECEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 DEC 2017 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 12 JAN 2018
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (‘OBJECTS’) ARE SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING: THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND FAMILIES IN SHEFFIELD AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN BY: OFFERING APPROPRIATE FACILITIES, ACTIVITIES AND TRAINING COURSES, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS AND CARERS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES, ENSURING SUCH ACTIVITIES OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN, REGARDLESS OF MEANS, SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS. ENCOURAGING THE UNDERSTANDING OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. PROVIDING FACILITIES AND SUPPORT SERVICES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. [NOTHING IN THE ARTICLES SHALL AUTHORISE AN APPLICATION OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITY FOR PURPOSES WHICH ARE NOT CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH SECTION 7 OF THE CHARITIES AND TRUSTEE INVESTMENT (SCOTLAND) ACT 2005 AND/OR SECTION 2 OF THE CHARITIES ACT (NORTHERN IRELAND) 2008.]
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE TIDDLYWINKS CENTRE
7 EASTERN DRIVE
SHEFFIELD
S2 3WP
- Phone:
- 01142531377
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window