Financial history THE FRIENDS OF AFRICA FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1079522
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017
Total gross income £4.48k £13.08k £1.22k £1.22k £1.22k
Total expenditure £24.95k £13.32k £1.62k £1.90k £3.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A