THE OAK TREE CLUBHOUSE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A service user lead service that provides social support for isolated people with mental health problems. The committee is made up of people who use the 'Clubhouse' and all decisions are made by the committee.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 04 December 2000: Standard registration
- 14 September 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.39k | £8.06k | £9.06k | £9.06k | £5.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.73k | £7.52k | £7.35k | £7.35k | £6.58k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 10 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 10 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 08 January 2018 | 342 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 2000 AS AMENDED 10 OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM MENTAL HEALTH PROBLEMS IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR TO OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WEYMOUTH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window