NETHERTON COTTAGE HOMES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bedsits, Almshouses
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kirklees
Governance
- 11 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARTYN DEAN | Chair | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Richard Heneghan | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Councillor Joanne Lawson | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Shorrock | Trustee | 19 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Alan Knight | Trustee | 10 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIE DEAN | Trustee | 24 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.53k | £4.00k | £4.00k | £3.60k | £4.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.46k | £4.61k | £4.79k | £4.64k | £4.67k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INDENTURE MADE 1 DECEMBER 1910
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FIVE COTTAGE HOMES FOR THE USE AND OCCUPATION BY POOR AND NECESSITOUS PERSONS LIVING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOUTH CROSLAND IN THE COUNTY OF YORK
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SOUTH CROSLAND IN THE COUNTY OF YORK
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 Lavender Court
Netherton
HUDDERSFIELD
HD4 7LW
- Phone:
- 01484 665777
- Email:
- gm.kent@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window