THE CURRIER'S COMPANY MILLENNIUM TRUST FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides annual bursaries for primary healthcare professionals to carry out research or further personal training to benefit healthcare provision amongst underprivileged communities in London.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 January 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Davies | Chair | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JOHN PIERS WILLIAMSON | Trustee | 18 October 2024 |
|
|||||
James Matthew Salt | Trustee | 26 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Latha Parvataneni | Trustee | 11 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr JONATHAN JAMES CORNELIUS HOLLIDAY CVO | Trustee | 15 December 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.41k | £8.94k | £9.24k | £12.18k | £7.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.34k | £16.00k | £21.24k | £6.91k | £6.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 07 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 30 NOVEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE AN ANNUAL BURSARY TO AN INDIVIDUAL WHO WILL BE SELECTED EACH YEAR IN OPEN COMPETITION BY THE TRUSTEES. THE BURSARY IS INTENDED TO PROVIDE FINANCIAL SUPPORT FOR STUDIES IN THE FOLLOWING AREAS: A) TRAINING COURSES IN FURTHERANCE OF PROFESSIONAL ASPIRATIONS, OR, B) RESEARCH INTO AN ASPECT OF SOCIAL NEED. THE RECIPENTS OF ALL SUCH BURSARIES WILL BE REQUIRED TO PROVIDE EVIDENCE OF ACHIEVEMENT IN THE FORM OF A PROFESSIONAL QUALIFICATION OR A PUBLISHABLE PAPER ON THEIR AREA OF RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
136-138 Colwith Road
Hammersmith
LONDON
W6 9EZ
- Phone:
- 02087488076
- Email:
- millennium@curriers.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window