MULTI CULTURAL INTEGRATION CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Multi Cultural Integration Centre receives funding to develop different projects involving people from a variety of social, economic and cultural backgrounds in order to raise cultural awareness and to expose ways in which racism and discrimination exclude and harm ethnic communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 17 July 2003: Standard registration
- THE MULTI CULTURAL INFORMATION CENTRE, NORTH EAST (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR PORTER | Chair | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Nicky Yaseri | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
May Al-Issa | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Ehsan Al-Yasiri | Trustee | 04 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ZAAROURA | Trustee | 26 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60 | £60 | £0 | £60 | £69 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £125 | £60 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 January 2025 | 83 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 May 2023 | 184 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 May 2022 | 206 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 November 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED DECEMBER 1996 AS AMENDED ON THE 14 MAY 2003 AND 4 NOVEMBER 2009
Charitable objects
(A) FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS IN THE NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') PARTICULARLY TO WORK TOWARDS THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY, TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY AND GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS. (B) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS. (C) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND OTHER ASSISTANCE IN MATTERS SUCH AS MONEY, DEBTS, WELFARE BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH, EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT TO REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
NORTH EAST OF ENGLAND
Contact information
- Address:
-
MULTI CULTURAL INTEGRATION CENTRE
182 PORTLAND ROAD
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE2 1DJ
- Phone:
- 07398659388
- Email:
- mcinfcen@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window